Accounts and annual returns CHLOES (HORSHAM)

Charity Number: 1154733
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 03 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2015 19 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 19 August 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2014 13 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 13 February 2015 On Time