CITY CHURCH GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build a strategic Christian community in the Gloucester area by: developing a close relationship with God, that we might become more like Him; developing close relationships with other Christians and other churches locally, nationally and internationally; reaching out to the community with spiritual and material support, especially to those who are hurt and unloved by society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 December 2013: CIO registration
- 24 June 2015: Funds received from 1092978 CITY CHURCH GLOUCESTER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ST JOHN JONES | Chair | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Samuel Ronald Cook | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louis Jakobus Krog | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glen Baker | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.05k | £96.10k | £104.29k | £97.30k | £125.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.37k | £93.02k | £90.94k | £103.50k | £123.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN GLOUCESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chapel
Seymour Road
GLOUCESTER
GL1 5PT
- Phone:
- 07825911220
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window