STOKE GABRIEL BOATING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The SGBA promotes community participation in healthy recreation in the area of the estuary of the River Dart, in particular by the provision of facilities, boats and instruction in the sports of sailing, kayaking, canoeing and rowing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 06 November 2013: CIO registration
- SGBA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Chisholm-Batten | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hammond | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alexander Barton-Wood | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Simmons | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Curror | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Lyle | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Aylmer LEWIS | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STAFFORD DEACON | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles GiLLMORE | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Waite CEng | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.82k | £44.85k | £56.95k | £74.27k | £74.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.58k | £27.97k | £41.89k | £59.36k | £71.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORTS OF SAILING, KAYAKING, CANOEING AND ROWING.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SGBA CLUBHOUSE
MILL POINT
STOKE GABRIEL
TOTNES
TQ9 6FX
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- admin@sgba.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window