LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the welfare of older people in Lewisham. Provide facilities and opportunities to meet, discuss matters of common interest and undertake action to advance their well being, Information and campaiging in the interests of older people locally or nationwide. Low cost events and outings for the Forum membership to relieve the effects of poverty and advance mental health and well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 08 August 2014: Standard registration
- LPF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRACE BLYTH | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jean Goodison | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fr Henry Anthony Atherton | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||
MRS STELLA AMAGBOKPA -NORTEY | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.46k | £57.73k | £45.61k | £5.78k | £12.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.67k | £56.77k | £33.65k | £35.39k | £17.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.41k | £28.45k | £37.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 06/08/2014 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2015 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES FOR WHICH THE FORUM IS ESTABLISHED AND TO WHICH IT IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED ARE TO PROMOTE THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE WHO WORK OR LIVE WITHIN OR VISIT THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM (“THE BOROUGH”): (A) PREVENTING OR RELIEVING POVERTY EXPERIENCED BY OLDER PEOPLE, BY DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ON FINANCIAL MATTERS AND SEEKING SUPPORT FOR CAMPAIGNS IN THE INTERESTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN THE BOROUGH, LONDON OR NATIONWIDE. (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND LIFE-LONG LEARNING BY IDENTIFYING RESOURCES AND OPPORTUNITIES AVAILABLE IN THE BOROUGH FOR OLDER PEOPLE TO ACQUIRE INFORMATION, LEARN NEW SKILLS AND REVIVE OLD ONES AND TO MEET AND DISCUSS MATTERS OF COMMON INTEREST, ENSURING THAT SO FAR AS IS REASONABLE ALL SUCH RESOURCES AND OPPORTUNITIES ARE OPEN TO ALL OLDER PEOPLE IRRESPECTIVE OF MATTERS REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSE (E)(1) BELOW, REFLECTING THE CULTURAL AND ETHNIC DIVERSITY OF THE BOROUGH. (C) PROMOTING THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF OLDER PEOPLE BY PROVIDING INFORMATION ON SUCH MATTERS AND IDENTIFYING RESOURCES AND OPPORTUNITIES AVAILABLE IN THE BOROUGH, THEREBY ENABLING AND EMPOWERING THOSE WHO MAY BE ENCOUNTERING ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ISOLATION OR ANY OTHER DISADVANTAGE. (D) PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY FOR A VARIETY OF REASONS BY PROVIDING A WELCOMING AND SAFE ENVIRONMENT TO MEET AND DISCUSS RELEVANT ISSUES, BY PROVIDING REGULAR INFORMATION ON ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS, AND BY COMBATING NEGATIVE PERCEPTIONS OF AGE AND THE ELDERLY IN THE MEDIA AND ELSEWHERE. (E) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTIVES, THE FORUM SHALL: (1) PROACTIVELY ENGAGE WITH OLDER PEOPLE IN THE BOROUGH WHATEVER THEIR AGE, GENDER, SEXUALITY, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS, BACKGROUND OR ABILITIES. (2) WORK WITH OTHER GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE BOROUGH HAVING SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTIVES, ESPECIALLY THOSE SERVING OR WORKING WITH INDIVIDUALS WHO MAY SUFFER DISCRIMINATION FOR ANY REASON. (F) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTIVES, THE FORUM MAY: (1) EMPLOY AND PAY ANY PERSON OR PERSONS TO SUPERVISE, ORGANISE AND CARRY ON THE WORK OF THE FORUM AND MAKE REASONABLE PROVISION FOR THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS. (2) ESTABLISH WHERE NECESSARY LOCAL SUB-GROUPS. (3) BRING TOGETHER IN CONFERENCE AND OTHERWISE REPRESENTATIVES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, LOCAL AND NATIONAL GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS. (4) PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, SURVEYS AND INVESTIGATIONS AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEREOF. (5) ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES. (6) COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE SAID OBJECTIVES AND EXCHANGE SUCH INFORMATION WITH OTHER BODIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTIVES. (7) UNDERTAKE, EXECUTE, MANAGE OR ASSIST ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN, EXECUTED, MANAGED OR ASSISTED BY THE FORUM. (8) CAUSE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINTED OR OTHERWISE REPRODUCED AND CIRCULATED (IN HARD COPY OR ELECTRONICALLY) E-MAILS, NEWSLETTERS, OR OTHER DOCUMENTS OR RECORDINGS. (9) PURCHASE, TAKE ON LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE, HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY PROPERTY OR OTHER RIGHTS OR ASSETS AND CONSTRUCT, MAINTAIN AND ALTER ANY BUILDINGS OR ERECTIONS NECESSARY FOR THE WORK OF THE FORUM. (10) MAKE REGULATIONS FOR ANY PROPERTY, RIGHTS OR ASSETS WHICH MAY BE SO ACQUIRED. (11) SELL, LET, MORTGAGE, DISPOSE OF OR TURN TO ACCOUNT ALL OR ANY OF THE PROPERTY, RIGHTS OR ASSETS OF THE FORUM. (12) BORROW OR RAISE MONEY AND ACCEPT GIFTS ON SUCH TERMS AND ON SUCH SECURITY AS SHALL BE DEEMED TO BE NECESSARY. (13) RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE GRANTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS. (14) INVEST MONEYS NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR THE SAID OBJECTIVES IN SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT. (15) PURCHASE AT THE FORUM’S EXPENSE TRUSTEE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COVER IN ACCORDANCE WITH, AND SUBJECT TO CONDITIONS IN, SECTION 189 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011. (16) CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MEMBERS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fifth Floor
Laurence House
Catford
London
SE6 4RU
- Phone:
- 02086907869
- Email:
- info@lpforum.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window