THE SID VALE ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring planning applications with particular reference to the AONB Keeping footpaths open and useable . running the Sidmouth Museum. Supporting local history society. Publishing books/leaflets of local interest Enhancing the environment of the River Sid. Excursions and walks around the Sid Valley. Providing, improving and maintaining open spaces for the enjoyment of the public?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- SVA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Tanner | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Cross | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony Wragg | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rose | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Clarke | Trustee | 28 June 2021 | ||||||
Gary Bryan Turner | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Huntington | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel Hyman | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE WARREN | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.10k | £127.24k | £120.83k | £380.47k | £339.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.16k | £90.57k | £98.61k | £154.62k | £236.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.53k | £16.87k | £1.40k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Nov 2013 as amended on 28 Jul 2021 as amended on 19 Jun 2024 as amended on 21 May 2025
Charitable objects
1) To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment. 2)To advance the education of the public through the establishment and maintenance of a museum and by facilitating research into the history of Sidmouth and the Sid Valley and publishing the results to the public. 3) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sid Vale Association CIO
12 Church Street
Sidmouth
Devon
EX10 8LY
- Phone:
- 07709936852
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window