Trustees ME, MYSELF & I NEATH PORT TALBOT
Charity number: 1155162

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Reed | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nicola Todd | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alec James Thomas | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lacey | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Stuart Oakes | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.