ENACTUS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enactus connects students, academic and business leaders through entrepreneurial-based projects that empower people to transform opportunities into real, sustainable progress for themselves and their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 2014: Standard registration
- SIFE UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN BENJAMIN LASSITER | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cooke | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Geraldine Burnett | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Wilson Miller | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Julia Sophie Dobson | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Jayne Fuller | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.13k | £142.81k | £94.30k | £103.40k | £202.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.19k | £71.84k | £57.49k | £77.97k | £222.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/01/2014
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN BUSINESS, COMMERCE AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SOCIAL ENTERPRISE; AND B) THE PROMOTION OF INDUSTRY, COMMERCE AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE WHICH: 1) RELIEVES POVERTY, 2) RELIEVES UNEMPLOYMENT, 3) ADVANCES HEALTH, 4) ADVANCES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT C) THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 (AND MATURE OR GRADUATE STUDENTS ENROLLED IN A PROGRAMME OF FURTHER, HIGHER OR POST-GRADUATE EDUCATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION AND FACILITATION OF SUPPORT, TRAINING AND PROJECTS WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE, RESPONSIBLE AND SOCIALLY CONSCIOUS INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Enactus UK, Ingenuity Centre
University of Notts Innovation Park
Triumph Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2TU
- Phone:
- 07395 502005
- Email:
- abrereton@enactus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window