Trustees HEALTHWATCH CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity Number: 1154627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Jackson Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Mandy HASLAM Trustee 01 March 2025
Saxons Scout Group
Received: On time
FALKES (LUTON) DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
STREATLEY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Alison Newnham Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Louise Cole Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
LINDA GRANT Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
GILL HISCOX Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record