Financial history PCP HOUSING

Charity number: 1154093
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £614.57k £459.91k £727.25k £576.62k £601.27k
Total expenditure £716.66k £538.40k £488.63k £538.25k £603.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £614.57k N/A £522.24k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £205.01k £548.97k £635.34k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £459.92k N/A £378.32k £428.85k £492.95k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £75.74k £76.72k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £16.31k £14.36k £10.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £256.74k N/A £110.31k £33.66k £33.82k