PCS AWARENESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a not for profit charity whose aims are to provide a counselling/psychotherapy service (Talking Therapy) in the local community. We help with a number of problems such as Bereavement, ADHD, Domestic violence,Anxiety and Stress etc. In addition we help homeless people before and after they are discharged from hospital. Established in 2013. We have one full time worker plus volunteers..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 17 December 2013: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Olasoji | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILKES | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.92k | £13.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1298 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1663 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1663 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED AND TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELL BEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING A FREE COUNSELLING SERVICE IN THE COMMUNITY FOR ALL REGARDLESS OF GENDER, ETHNICITY, AGE, DISABILITY OR RELIGION; (B) HELPING AND SUPPORTING VULNERABLE PEOPLE BEFORE AND AFTER THEY ARE DISCHARGE FROM HOSPITAL WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUPPORT WITH THEIR RECOVERY OR RECUPERATION; (C) PROVIDING TRAINING AND WORKSHOP FOR SELF HELP GROUP ('TALKING THERAPIES') FOR THOSE WORRIED ABOUT DRUGS AND ALCOHOL ADDICTION; AND (D) THROUGH EDUCATION AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF HEALTHCARE ISSUES CONCERNING SERVICE USERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Marlowe Innovation Centre
Marlowe Way
Ramsgate
CT12 6FA
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- pcs.awarenesstrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window