SHALOM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sundays: 10:00 am - Worship Services for members and members of the public who attend (Motivational, encouragement, Christian education & faith discussions). Wednesdays: 7:30 pm - Faith Clinic (Prayers, encouragement, inspirational discussions, Bible study). Saturdays: Outreaches; Counsel & support to members of the public; Visitation; Educational support, motivational teachings & Career Guidance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GODWIN ABAYOMI ADEGBITE | Chair | 20 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Adesola Oluwayemi Ogunbadejo | Trustee | 19 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABIMBOLA FOLASHADE AKINNIRANYE | Trustee | 20 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.60k | £52.47k | £64.16k | £64.34k | £64.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.53k | £37.22k | £47.24k | £40.16k | £44.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE ALL FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND THESE ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS AND SERVICES OF ANY KIND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Martins Close
STANFORD-LE-HOPE
Essex
SS17 8AB
- Phone:
- 01708929930
- Email:
- info@rccgshalomcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window