WEST RIDING KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of sickness & distress for kidney patients - especially those receiving/having received treatment for kidney disease at Leeds Teaching Hospitals NHS Trust - includes support provision, advice & information to families/carers of such patients Educating the public concerning kidney diseases & their treatments- particularly promoting donation of organs for transplantation Promoting research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- WEST RIDING KPA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOONDRANUTH GUNGARAM | Chair | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Aaron Spink | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr CLAIRE LOUISE CORPS BSC.MSC.PH | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANN Spink | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.26k | £14.19k | £2.55k | £22.06k | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.21k | £12.30k | £5.77k | £6.13k | £5.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG KIDNEY PATIENTS, AND ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE RECEIVING OR HAVE RECEIVED TREATMENT FOR ANY KIDNEY DISEASE AT LEEDS TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS TRUST, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH PATIENTS. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING KIDNEY DISEASES AND THEIR TREATMENTS, PARTICULARLY WITH THE OBJECT OF PROMOTING THE DONATION OF ORGANS FOR TRANSPLANTATION. (C) TO PROMOTE AND FUND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO KIDNEY DISEASES AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT .
Contact information
- Address:
-
296 OAKWOOD LANE
LEEDS
LS8 3LE
- Phone:
- 01132940773
- Email:
- davespink_2000@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window