FRIENDS OF MONZE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to relieve or prevent poverty in Monze. FoM assists in the provision of education, training, healthcare projects and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals and community groups to generate income and be self-sufficient. Fund-raising activities include presentations to organisations, individual donations, and grants from grant-giving bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bridgend
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 November 2013: CIO registration
- 03 May 2023: Funds received from 1168277 MAYA PROJECT
- NONE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Virginia Jane Deana Owen | Chair | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anfield Davies Mr | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Joan Green | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Green | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.38k | £101.87k | £131.52k | £131.47k | £126.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.72k | £100.13k | £139.10k | £127.34k | £132.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Nov 2013 as amended on 02 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN MONZE IN ZAMBIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Clos Castell Newydd
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 5DR
- Phone:
- 07807660543
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window