Trustees HIGHCROFT COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO
Charity number: 1153987

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK WOOTON | Chair | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Dance | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Vernalls | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Nash | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Thrupp | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Dockery | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Gouldingay | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alun Paul Williams | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANK HARRIS | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.