UK KOTLI FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Get together and fund raising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Luton
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 January 2014: Standard registration
- 13 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £2.43k | £207 | £240 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00k | £1.12k | £65 | £60 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECT) ARE: PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND KOTLI (AZAD KASHMIR) BY MAKING GRANTS, PROVIDING PROVISIONS AND ADVICE. IMPROVING AND ADVANCING EDUCATION IN THE UK AND KOTLI, PARTICULARLY COMMUNITY EDUCATION VIA SEMINARS, TRAINING EVENTS AND PROVIDING SUPPORT TO SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN THE UK AND KOTLI BY WORKING AND SUPPORTING MEDICAL OR HEALTH INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER CHARITIES TO PREVENT SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING, AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH.TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND KOTLI, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Area of benefit
UK AND KOTLI
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window