INSPIRE MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Inspire Movement promotes discipleship & mission among Christians by developing & supporting the practice of small group fellowship bands; equipping church leaders for disciple-making ministry; encouraging ordinary Christians to grow in their discipleship. It provides advice, training & resources, serving people from different denominations & networks in the UK, Ireland, USA, & other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- United States
Governance
- 17 March 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Christopher Heathcote | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Rose Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Melvyn Nigel Eric Cooke | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.71k | £12.28k | £21.92k | £12.96k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £11.23k | £18.51k | £14.54k | £3.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROMOTION OF DISCIPLESHIP AND MISSION AMONG CHRISTIANS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND IN SUCH OTHER AWAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Woodland Walk
Chesterfield
S40 4YB
- Phone:
- 07910016776
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window