THE CASCADE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with disengaged ex-offenders and community members of all ages with dyslexia, head-injury and other learning difficulties. We have moved back to Essex and helping people on line, zoom or phone. Our professional development courses and Innovative projects have led us to work with Channel 4 'The Write Offs' programme, sharing our bespoke learning activities with schools and universities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 30 September 2013: CIO registration
- 03 April 2014: Funds received from 1061224 KELTEK TRUST
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD MAIN MBE | Chair | 17 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Blakeman | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN BLACKBURN | Trustee | 17 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH LEWIS OBE | Trustee | 17 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.04k | £5.52k | £876 | £325 | £375 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.77k | £9.33k | £553 | £653 | £85 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.08k | N/A | £508 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE WHO ARE DEEMED TO BE AT RISK OF OFFENDING (AND THEIR FAMILIES) WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES RELATED TO DYSLEXIA OR HEAD-INJURIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): A. THE PROVISION OF SKILLS TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL, PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES. B. THE PROVISION OF ‘TRANSITION’ CENTRES PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND TRAINING. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING DYSLEXIA AND SIMILAR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): A. THE PROVISION OF OUTREACH AND OTHER SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS. B. PROVIDING OR FACILITATING THE LEARNING AND SKILLS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN ANY SETTING WHO EXPERIENCE DIFFICULTIES RELATED TO DYSLEXIA OR HEAD INJURIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Kents Hill Road
BENFLEET
Essex
SS7 5PL
- Phone:
- 07761478079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window