HELLO BEAUTIFUL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hello Beautiful Foundation provides a support network for people that have been affected by cancer. The Foundation speaks openly about Non-Toxic Practice and how to live sustainably
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Lambeth
- Middlesbrough
- Southwark
- Stockton-on-tees
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 August 2014: Standard registration
- HELLO BEAUTIFUL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN HELTON | Chair | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Marie Christine | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Soteriou | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angelina Palus | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE HUTCHISON | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.01k | £155.74k | £70.56k | £120.44k | £93.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.01k | £155.74k | £70.56k | £120.44k | £93.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.70k | £32.04k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/08/2014
Charitable objects
1)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER AND RELATED ILLNESSES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT; AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC’S EDUCATION CONCERNING CANCER AND WAYS TO REDUCE THE CHANCE OF FALLING VICTIM TO THE DISEASE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY USING ART EXHIBITIONS AS A MEANS OF RAISING AWARENESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELLO BEAUTIFUL FOUNDATION
62-64 Southampton Row
LONDON
WC1B 4AR
- Phone:
- 02087659625
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window