EDEN GATE NEWPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Newport, South Wales, and working in partnership with churches and organisations to provide a drop-in and varied programme of "Shoulder-to-Shoulder" activities for guests. The charity offers both practical and health support, including freedom from addiction, help with the development of soft and employability skills and encouragement to move towards sustainable, independent living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,366 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 11 November 2013: CIO registration
- EDEN GATE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Reed | Chair | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Elizabeth Dando | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alyson Thomas | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Canon Richard Andrew Lightbown | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela McCarthy | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Franz Cristoph Armin Huelle | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Taylor | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.95k | £138.94k | £167.01k | £150.52k | £133.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.74k | £135.81k | £113.84k | £131.90k | £145.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £99.60k | £72.97k | £112.67k | £82.40k | £27.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF NEWPORT, SOUTH WALES (AND SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR THOSE WHO HAVE A SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCE BY:- 1)PROVIDING SERVICES TO PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BEING AFFECTED BY SUCH CONDITIONS AND TO ALLEVIATE THE EFFECTS OF SUCH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF REHABILITATION PROGRAMMES AND SUPPORT TO INTEGRATE THEM BACK INTO SOCIETY; 2)EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HOMELESSNESS AND SUBSTANCE DEPENDENCE AND ABUSE; AND 3)BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE THE WORK OF THE CHARITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY WORKING WITH CHRISTIAN CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
NEWPORT, SOUTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Hill Street
NEWPORT
NP20 1LZ
- Phone:
- 01633243235
- Email:
- info@edengate.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window