FIRE FOUNTAIN MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) The propagation of the gospel of Jesus Christ to members and the public 2) Offering religious education, counseling and advice. 3} Offering humanitarian support to members and the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 13 December 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR DANIEL DANNY DANQUAH | Chair | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin HAGAN | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GIFTY KYEI DANQUAH | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NANCY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BOATENG | Trustee | 06 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.44k | £235.55k | £334.17k | £240.36k | £326.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.86k | £217.57k | £297.94k | £281.20k | £357.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2. RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lammas Drive
BRAINTREE
CM7 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07448018941
- Email:
- ffminint@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window