EAGLE WORLD OUTREACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grace House Worship Centre (Working name) The Noble Woman Ministry (Working name) Aims and activities of Eagle World Outreach Poverty Relief Worldwide Worship Services Leadership and Skills Training & Support for Social Enterprise Projects and workshop For Children, Youth, Women & Less Privileged Church Planting Local Community Projects, workshop, focused events and Initiatives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 26 November 2013: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GRACE HOUSE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £16.58k | £11.77k | £10.22k | £246 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.06k | £17.47k | £10.20k | £9.82k | £259 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 13 January 2020 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window