THE FIRS SCHOOL BURSARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils at The Firs School by providing and assisting in contributions towards the fees payable to the school by pupils who would be unable to continue their education or commence education without financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 15 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Longman | Chair | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jan Lawrenson | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN HEALY | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CHESHIRE | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.55k | £121.98k | £114.44k | £84.93k | £105.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.14k | £116.92k | £106.03k | £85.16k | £78.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE FIRS SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING ON CONTRIBUTIONS TOWARDS THE FEES PAYABLE TO THE SCHOOL BY PUPILS WHO WOULD BE UNABLE TO CONTINUE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL WITHOUT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR WHO WOULD BE UNABLE TO COMMENCE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL DESPITE BEING ACCEPTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRS SCHOOL
45 NEWTON LANE
CHESTER
CH2 2HJ
- Phone:
- 01244322443
- Email:
- fsbt@firsschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window