THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS EALING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints is a parish church of The Church of England. As a public place of worship, it is available for worship and spiritual guidance for all, and the provision of the important ceremonies of baptism, marriage and funerals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 02 October 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS CHURCH PCC EALING COMMON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catarina Siqueira-Armond | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nick Harvey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Belinda McLaughlan | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Mo Perkins | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN PERKINS | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.06k | £71.14k | £101.68k | £147.50k | £152.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.13k | £69.57k | £91.28k | £134.30k | £133.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2022 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints
Elm Grove Road
Ealing
London
W5 3JH
- Phone:
- 07442 105837
- Email:
- allsaintsealing@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window