Accounts and annual returns TERRAMAR (UK)

Charity number: 1154106
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required