Financial history TERRAMAR (UK)

Charity number: 1154106
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £5.63k £5.03k £28 £1.22k £2.27k
Total expenditure £1.50k £1.52k £1.38k £1.20k £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A