Financial history PEOPLE FOR ANIMAL CARE TRUST (PACT)

Charity Number: 1154444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.66m £1.71m £2.13m £3.03m £2.30m
Total expenditure £1.94m £1.62m £1.97m £2.37m £2.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £468.21k £46.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £836.78k £815.37k £1.08m £2.00m £1.06m
Income - Other trading activities £819.88k £134.57k £981.86k £1.02m £1.24m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £761.45k £64.51k £0 £500
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £295
Income - Legacies £294.67k £210.04k £526.41k £1.31m £667.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.05m £1.19m £1.75m £1.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £20.24k £54.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £922.91k £568.07k £775.45k £620.47k £320.64k