FRIENDS OF THE BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote, support and increase awareness of the 260,000 British Citizens that live in the sixteen British Overseas Territories. We want to celebrate the culture, bio-diversity, and history of the territories and support students from the territories studying in the UK as well as holding successful networking/social events to discuss the challenges facing the Overseas Territories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Albert Andrew Poggio GMH OBE | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Philip Richard Smith | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Harjinder Jutle | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Mark Joseph Leary | Trustee | 17 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.48k | £16.60k | £41.16k | £55.25k | £41.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.53k | £14.68k | £40.90k | £53.76k | £38.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Apr 2014 as amended on 08 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF STUDENTS FROM THE BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORIES WHO ARE STUDYING IN THE UK. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORIES AND THE HISTORY AND GEOGRAPHY OF THE BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORIES. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 18 AND 25 BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL VISITS TO THE BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORIES 4. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOTBOT
PO Box 2635
ILFORD
United Kingdom
IG1 8UA
- Phone:
- 07929 624111
- Email:
- enquiries@fotbot.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window