WORLD TREE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The protection and enhancement of existing rain forests and the encouragement of tree planting by the community in tropical regions. Preservation of the environment and discouraging use of plastic products and encouraging suitable methods of disposal and/or recycling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Thailand
Governance
- 03 October 2013: Standard registration
- 28 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.55k | £2.00k | £0 | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £15.11k | £26.66k | £16.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 01 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 25 May 2017 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY PROTECTING AND ENHANCING EXISTING WOODLANDS AND ENCOURAGING TREE PLANTING IN COMMUNITIES, IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE BENEFITS OF A HEALTHY RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN TREES AND HUMANS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window