LEEDS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY FOR SINGLE LADIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help elderly single ladies in need, to include but not limited to: regular payments in cash or benefits in kind; grants in cases of extreme necessity; funding social activities to alleviate loneliness and isolation;funding female geriatric health research; funding other social enterprises whose objects relate to health & safety and relief of sickness and disability of elderly ladies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 February 2014: CIO registration
- 02 May 2014: Funds received from 227343 THE LEEDS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY FOR SINGLE LADIES
- LBSSL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Hill | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Astrid Lloyd | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLIAN MARY WOOLER | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANONA DENISE EVERETT | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SALLY-ANNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE CAROLINE WAINMAN | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGH SIMPSON | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JILL ELIZABETH RICHARDSON | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Wooler | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|||||
NIGEL APPLEYARD WAINMAN | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|||||
ELISABETH ANNE STEPHENS | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
FREDA NORA ELLIS | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE PRIMROSE SMITHSON | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.71k | £144.02k | £132.39k | £129.03k | £134.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.08k | £214.55k | £160.51k | £231.14k | £204.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO HELP ELDERLY SINGLE LADIES IN NEED SUBJECT TO THE TERMS OF THIS CONSTITUTION ? WITH THIS HELP INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVISION OF THE FOLLOWING: (1) REGULAR PAYMENTS TO ELDERLY SINGLE LADIES IN NEED, IN THE FORM OF CASH AND OTHER BENEFITS IN KIND; AND/OR (2) GRANTS TO ELDERLY SINGLE LADIES IN CASES OF EXTREME NECESSITY AND EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES; AND/OR (3) FUNDING SOCIAL ACTIVITIES TO ALLEVIATE LONELINESS AND ISOLATION AS IS OFTEN SUFFERED BY ELDERLY SINGLE LADIES; AND/OR 3.1.2 FUNDING AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF FEMALE GERIATRIC HEALTH RESEARCH; AND/OR 3.1.3 FUNDING SUPPORT FOR CHARITIES, NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OR SOCIAL ENTERPRISES WHOSE OBJECTS DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY COVER THE PROTECTION, PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF ELDERLY LADIES AND/OR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY AFFECTING ELDERLY LADIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST COTTAGE
12 EASTGATE
BRAMHOPE
LEEDS
LS16 9AB
- Phone:
- 01132843815
- Email:
- anonaeverett@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window