THE CENTRE FOR ISLAM AND MEDICINE

Charity Number: 1154937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Centre for Islam and Medicine (CIM) seeks to enrich the field of bioethics through research, training, education and policy contribution.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,005
Total expenditure: £853

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CIM (Working name)
  • CENTRE FOR ISLAM AND MEDICINE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sahira Dar Chair 01 April 2023
None on record
Safwaan Hafez Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Sabia Rehman Trustee 01 April 2023
DIVERSECITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Saif Quader Trustee 14 November 2015
TALEEM FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.86k £6.09k £4.03k £2.50k £1.00k
Total expenditure £9.74k £2.38k £18.50k £859 £853
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
International House
36-38 Cornhill
London
EC3V 3NG
Phone:
07951847363