Financial history CAERPHILLY WORKMENS HALL

Charity number: 1158006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.45k £18.82k £15.73k £25.84k £22.72k
Total expenditure £13.24k £10.31k £27.10k £29.88k £25.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.00k £12.00k £14.40k £12.05k