THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE (HEYHOUSES), ST ANNES-ON-SEA, LANCASHIRE.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Services of baptism, marriage and funeral for all residents of the parish Sacred space for private prayer Pastoral work with the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity Religious assemblies in the local primary school. Provision of a Sunday School, Mothers' Union, Men's Fellowship, Parent/Toddler Group and social activities. Support to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 January 2014: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANNES-ON-SEA PARISH CHURCH PCC (Working name)
- ?THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE (HEYHOUSES), ST ANNES-ON-SEA, LANCASHIRE. (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen Brooks | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
William Robert Hoskins | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Pitches | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Haslem Gilbraith | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Campbell | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ryan Philip Otley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Brenda Streatfield | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Fletcher | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan McMahon | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Dawson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Vause | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hankinson | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MARTIN COUSINS | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Henry Claude Hembrow | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA KINGHORN | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Duke | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WOOLLEY BAKER | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.73k | £160.19k | £152.34k | £191.33k | £343.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.09k | £151.31k | £147.77k | £209.38k | £367.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.75k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Annes Parish Church Office
2a Oxford Road
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
FY8 2EA
- Phone:
- 01253-722736
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window