COUNSELLING LIFE ADVICE SUICIDE PREVENTATION (CLASP) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CLASP vision is to promote mental health equality and end discrimination for people with mental health disabilities. Our mission is to advise, empower and inspire people, businesses and organisations across the country by promoting Equality Act 2010 statutory duty protecting people with mental health disabilities. Our platforms champion mental health equality for employers and service providers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2013: Standard registration
- CLASP CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Boorer | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vera Aikins | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Johnston | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.16k | £71.34k | £39.98k | £42.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.36k | £64.17k | £41.81k | £45.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COUNSELLING BY MEANS OF A TELEPHONE HELPLINE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL STRESS, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ABUSE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLASP Charity
c/o Williams Giles Accountants Ltd
12 Conqueror Court
Sittingbourne
Kent
ME10 5BH
- Phone:
- 02036003601
- Email:
- hello@claspcharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window