Accounts and annual returns THE CELLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 504070
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 November 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required