CELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting practice and appreciation of visual art for the public benefit and advancement of education in the arts, by establishing an art gallery to provide ongoing exhibitions, educational events for schools, lectures and intern training programmes with financial support by Arts Council England. Continued support for artists who are in financial need by assisting with studio space for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hackney
- Lewisham
- Newham
- Southwark
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 07 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MILIKA CAROL MURITU MA BA HONS | Chair | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Chesterman | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PRIESTLEY MA BA HONS | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.84k | £1.04m | £496.75k | £182.92k | £119.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.49k | £974.67k | £479.10k | £210.50k | £131.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £1.04m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £974.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JUN 2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE APPRECIATION OF ART AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- ·THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY; ·THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND INTERN TRAINING PROGRAMMES;AND ·BY SUPPORTING ARTISTS WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED BY ASSISTING WITH WORKING STUDIO SPACE FOR THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
256-258 Cambridge Heath Road
Bethnal Green
LONDON
E2 9DA
- Phone:
- 02089816336
- Email:
- info@cellfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window