LNWR GEORGE THE FIFTH STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Construction of full size steam locomotive 'Prince George' for use on both the main rail nrtwork of the UK and heritage railways A heritage and education project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy James Spiers | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Connellan | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Terence McMenamin | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD COSTELLO | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEREK BUCKLES | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £23.68k | £10.94k | £9.56k | £27.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.49k | £19.94k | £12.42k | £5.48k | £45.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 December 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO BUILD, PRESERVE, OPERATE, MAINTAIN AND EXHIBIT FOR EDUCATIONAL AND INSTRUCTIONAL PURPOSES LOCOMOTIVES OF HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE BUILT BY, ACQUIRED BY OR LEASED OR OTHERWISE MADE AVAILABLE TO THE CHARITY AND IN PARTICULAR A LONDON AND NORTHWESTERN RAILWAY 'GEORGE THE FIFTH' CLASS EXPRESS PASSENGER LOCOMOTIVE. (B) TO USE THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY TO PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORICAL, EDUCATIONAL, SCIENTIFIC AND CULTURAL ASPECTS OF THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO ITS HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Coombe Lane
Enford
PEWSEY
Wiltshire
SN9 6DF
- Phone:
- 07768201106
- Email:
- georgevtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
lnwrgeorgevtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window