CROFTLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplying facilities for various local groups to use : Dancing (various), Yoga, Youth Club, Police, Local authority, parties etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,200 from 1 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 April 1975: Standard registration
- "CROFTLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION" (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Denney Irving | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Norma Sansom | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Knibbs | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Rice | Trustee | 01 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Turner | Trustee | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.33k | £5.81k | £20.51k | £29.94k | £27.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.25k | £9.23k | £16.16k | £27.01k | £21.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £2.67k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APR 1973 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 1977 AS AMENDED ON 19 APR 2022
Charitable objects
• TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AREA DEFINED BY THE LA12 POSTCODE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, GENDER, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN ORDER TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AND ADVANCING EDUCATION, WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. • TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE COMMUNITY CENTRE OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN ITS MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT, FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croftlands Community Centre
Central Drive
ULVERSTON
LA12 9JN
- Phone:
- 07745681718
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window