Financial history The Rooftop Arts Centre

Charity number: 1154960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.62k £49.59k £32.21k £22.45k £85.34k
Total expenditure £25.20k £24.10k £26.40k £37.40k £66.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.00k £16.00k N/A £1.00k