Trustees DURHAM DRAMATIC SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 1156923

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Clark | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Cubello | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Coates | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Gander | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kristian Colling | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Gander | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN ANDERSON | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DRUMMOND MOVERLEY SMITH | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAGGER | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|||||
WENDY FRANCES SMITH | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.