DOT COM CHILDRENS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our programme is a universal safeguarding tool. It is taught in schools using the Dot Journals to help every child realise their potential. The journals are used in lessons that help children learn how to identify when they feel safe and when they feel unsafe, helping them develop strategies to deal with danger and teach them who to urn to if they need help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 December 2013: Standard registration
- DOT COM CHILDRENS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Charles Henley | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £168.14k | £2.34k | £1.53k | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £69.45k | £2.30k | £1.55k | £87 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 July 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AND THEIR PARENTS AND/OR GUARDIANS PARTICULARLY THROUGH PROVIDING A PROGRAMME OF EDUCATION AIMED AT TEACHING CHILDREN HOW TO VALUE THEMSELVES AND OTHERS AND PROVIDE SAFETY TRAINING TO ENABLE CHILDREN TO BE EQUIPPED TO MAKE BETTER CHOICES IN LIFE, PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 SHELTON STREET
COVENT GARDEN
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 07407295954
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window