HEADWAY BLACKPOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Headway Blackpool Wyre and Fylde aims to provide information, support and social activities for people suffering from acquired brain injury. We also aim to support carers, family and friends. Perhaps most importantly, we offer the chance to share experiences knowing that the group members understand some of the problems and difficulties that acquired brain injury brings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 June 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Richard Evans | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Rybczynski | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Sloan | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Young | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.50k | £23.88k | £42.95k | £31.65k | £34.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.89k | £18.09k | £25.31k | £25.04k | £34.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2023 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2023 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/06/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN BLACKPOOL, WYRE AND FYLDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE SUFFERED A BRAIN INJURY, THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONALS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SERVICES AND FACILITIES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS RELATING TO BRAIN INJURY AND ITS PREVENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gresham Wealth Management Ltd
Cecil Court
28-36 Cecil Road
Hale
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 9PB
- Phone:
- 01619739150
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window