REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY, SELLY OAK, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide training for youth and children, counseling for people on family life, dealing with bereavement etc. We support people financially. We advance the Christian Faith in accordance with the statement of beliefs in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom We relieve sickness and promote and preserve good health by providing funds, goods or services of any kind,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £16,576 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 September 2013: Standard registration
- RCCG COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY, SELLY OAK, BIRMINGHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BREAKTHROUGH OLAWALE | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
TEMITAYO OLAIFA | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADAIAH YAHAYA | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fredrick Mogekwu | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
TOYOSI AROWOLO - FADIMU | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Richard Adekoya | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julianah Amao | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samson Olugbenga Fadimu | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Olubukola Arowolo | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.39k | £30.58k | £30.80k | £55.53k | £89.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | £15.40k | £21.90k | £37.78k | £54.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.94k | N/A | £4.94k | £16.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE; AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 THE FORDROUGH
NORTHFIELD
BIRMINGHAM
B31 3LS
- Phone:
- 01214111464
- Email:
- RANTIAROWOLO@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window