FOUNDATIONS FOR HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention of relief of poverty in particular in the Middle East and Africa by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Egypt
- Sudan
Governance
- 30 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
His Eminence Anba Angaelos OBE | Chair | 13 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
ROSEMARY SALEH | Trustee | 07 February 2016 |
|
|||||||||
DR Magdy Latif El Sanady | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
David nabeel Zaki Boutros | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
CHRISTYAN FAWZI MALEK | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MATTHEW KHALIL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
GEORGE NAGY BARBARY | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr FAHMY FAYEZ FAHMY | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ONSY KEROLLOS MORRIS | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Dr WAGUIH KHALIL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr RAOUF AZMY DAOUD | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CAMELIA GABRIEL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DR MAGDY ISHAK-HANNA | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.82k | £129.84k | £181.85k | £77.33k | £142.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR IN THE MIDDLE EAST AND AFRICA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 22
Odette Court
Station Road
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 1GQ
- Phone:
- 02079936714
- Email:
- admin@foundationsforhope.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window