Financial history THE MISSION OF HOPE

Charity Number: 1155408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.25k £7.61k £18.92k £25.28k £33.49k
Total expenditure £144 £9.04k £30.20k £31.43k £24.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A