Financial history SHRI GURU RAVIDASS CULTURAL ASSOCIATION OF ERITH AND BELVEDERE

Charity number: 1161771
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £127.96k £106.44k £38.18k £65.58k £104.71k
Total expenditure £42.16k £144.73k £145.80k £102.07k £152.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A