VILLAGE VENTURES AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with orphans in Mauritania to make life a little more tolerable. Working on 'self-help' programs for some of the poorest people in Africa ie Mali and Mauritania. Due to the war these projects were extended to the people living in Ukraine, donating necessities to help the Ukrainians survive
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 01 November 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAMELA KATHERINE YOUNG | Chair | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Christine Fardon | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CEDRIC HALL | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.12k | £9.05k | £5.92k | £16.26k | £16.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.39k | £6.40k | £5.91k | £16.54k | £16.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 April 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 April 2022 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE SUPPLIES, FOOD, WATER AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Hollow
Bamford
HOPE VALLEY
Derbyshire
S33 0DU
- Phone:
- 07858267880
- Email:
- villageventures@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window