LAGAN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lagan's Foundation provide specialist home and community respite care services to families of children aged 0-19 with complex health conditions. Specialising in cardiac conditions and feeding difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £306,449 from 3 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2013: CIO registration
- 05 January 2022: Funds received from 1145316 HAND ON HEART
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN BELL | Chair | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Neil Hutton | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Tomkin | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Russell Ashwoth | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOWARTH | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.89k | £296.40k | £472.67k | £395.82k | £387.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.89k | £214.39k | £363.19k | £396.05k | £417.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £107.49k | £198.93k | £300.23k | £341.06k | £306.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.14k | £11.82k | £7.34k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN UNDER FIVE WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH AN ACQUIRED OR CONGENITAL HEART DEFECT AND/OR FEEDING DIFFICULTIES AND TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND RESPITE CARE; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO NEO-NATAL CARE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RELATING TO CONGENITAL DEFECTS OR FEEDING DIFFICULTIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flexspace Bolton
Manchester Road
BOLTON
BL3 2NZ
- Phone:
- 01204800300
- Email:
- info@lagans.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window