Financial history STREETS OF LONDON

Charity number: 1155242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.18k £89.91k £212.01k £159.13k £195.66k
Total expenditure £139.56k £74.72k £188.90k £179.17k £215.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.16k N/A N/A N/A