Accounts and annual returns CLUB DES AMIS UK

Charity number: 1156004
Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 29 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
Annual return 29 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 833 days
Annual return 29 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1198 days
Annual return 29 March 2020 12 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2020 12 February 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window