Financial history CLUB DES AMIS UK

Charity number: 1156004
Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 29/03/2018 29/03/2019 29/03/2020
Total gross income £14.32k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £12.15k £0 £0 £0 £2.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A